Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session



Public Schools - Student Sunscreen Use - Policy

Sponsored by:

Senator Young


In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20181/18/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2/19/20182/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/20182/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {544231/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/22/20182/22/2018Third Reading Passed (44-0)32
House2/23/20182/23/2018First Reading Ways and Means33
3/5/20183/5/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

March 5, 2018 12:35 P.M.