SB0231 (CH0476)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for Protection

Sponsored by:

Senator Edwards

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20141/16/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
2/10/20142/10/2014Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report Adopted22
Second Reading Passed22
2/12/20142/12/2014Third Reading Passed (43-2)24
House2/13/20142/13/2014First Reading Judiciary27
3/5/20143/5/2014Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20144/7/2014Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/7/20144/2/2014Favorable Report Adopted69
Second Reading Passed69
4/7/20144/3/2014Third Reading Passed (120-9)70
Senate4/8/20144/1/2014Returned Passed66A
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2014 11:37 A.M.