SB0248 (CH0149)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Use of Handgun in Crime of Violence or Felony - Statute of Limitations

Sponsored by:

Senator Frosh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20141/17/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/6/20143/6/2014Favorable with Amendments {608672/140
Committee Amendment {608672/1 Withdrawn40
Substitute Committee Amendment (Judicial Proceedings) {608672/2 Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/10/20143/7/2014Third Reading Passed (35-12)41A
House3/11/20143/8/2014First Reading Judiciary44
3/12/20143/12/2014Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/1/20143/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/2/20143/26/2014Third Reading Passed (132-0)62
Senate4/3/20143/25/2014Returned Passed59
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:55 P.M.