SB0256

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Pinsky

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/19/20181/19/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {504331/135
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted35
2/28/20182/28/2018Favorable with Amendments {504331/1 Report Adopted36
Floor Amendment {473328/1 (Senator Hough)36
Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted36
Floor Amendment {473328/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (20-25)36
Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted 36
3/1/20183/1/2018Floor Amendment {563423/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (20-24)37
Floor Amendment {493721/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (20-26)37
Floor Amendment {213029/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29)37
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hough) Rejected (18-28)37
Second Reading Passed with Amendments37
3/5/20183/5/2018Third Reading Passed (28-17)39
House3/6/20183/6/2018First Reading Ways and Means40
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 7, 2018 1:53 P.M.