SB0273

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Edwards

Status:

In the Senate - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {969932/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/16/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/16/20173/13/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation47
3/17/20173/17/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments {490014/1 Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed with Amendments67
4/10/20174/4/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-4)69
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (45-0)63A
Passed Enrolled63A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2017 9:48 P.M.