SB0296

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Thirsty Kids Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Montgomery

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20152/5/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20153/9/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/20153/10/2015Favorable with Amendments {654437/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/12/20153/12/2015Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)41
3/16/20153/16/2015Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:47 P.M.