SB0297

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - De Minimis Quantity

Sponsored by:

Senator Zirkin

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {178774/143
Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted43
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable with Amendments {178774/144
Committee Amendment Adopted44
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {173320/1 Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/15/20133/15/2013Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 46
3/18/20133/16/2013Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 47
3/19/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (30-16)48
House3/19/20133/16/2013First Reading Judiciary49
3/19/20133/19/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:07 P.M.