SB0317 (CH0149)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20173/24/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/24/20173/22/2017Favorable with Amendments {549137/151
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted51
3/28/20173/24/2017Favorable with Amendments {549137/1 Budget and Taxation Report Adopted53
Floor Committee Amendment {739336/1 Adopted53
Floor Amendment {863526/1 (Senator Manno) Rejected (8-34)53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/29/20173/25/2017Third Reading Passed (45-1)54
House3/30/20173/26/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations60
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/10/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments {795566/170
Committee Amendment Withdrawn70
Substitute Committee Amendment {685065/2 Adopted70
Second Reading Passed with Amendments70
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Walker) Adopted (133-0)70
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)70
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (46-1)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.