SB0317

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

Senator Pinsky

Status:

In the House - Conference Committee Appointed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
1/26/20181/26/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {944238/145
Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted45
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments {944238/1 Report Adopted (33-13)46
Floor Amendment {183820/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30)46
Floor Amendment {163922/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30)46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20183/16/2018Third Reading Passed (31-13)48
House3/16/20183/13/2018First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations47
3/17/20183/17/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments {375063/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/9/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (91-44)66
Senate4/9/20184/4/2018Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments66
Senate Requests House Recede66
Conference Committee Appointed66
Senators Pinsky, Kagan, and Waugh66
House4/9/20184/4/2018House Refuses to Recede69
Conference Committee Appointed69
Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole, and Patterson69

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 11:54 P.M.