SB0334

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2/12/20152/12/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/2/20153/2/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/3/20153/3/2015Favorable with Amendments {499235/1 Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed with Amendments34
3/5/20153/5/2015Third Reading Passed (47-0)36
House3/6/20153/6/2015First Reading Ways and Means38
3/10/20153/10/2015Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20153/17/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20154/2/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/2/20153/29/2015Favorable with Amendments {135267/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20153/30/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)60
Senate4/7/20153/31/2015Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments58
Senate Requests House Recede58
Conference Committee Appointed58
Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, and Eckardt58
House4/7/20154/1/2015House Refuses to Recede62
Conference Committee Appointed62
Delegates M. Washington, Hornberger, and Ebersole62
Senate4/9/20154/2/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted60
Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/9/20154/3/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted64
Third Reading Passed (138-0)64
Senate4/9/20154/2/2015Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.