SB0360

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (The Maryland Cares for Kids Act)

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20171/25/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2/21/20172/21/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable38
Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 38
3/8/20173/8/2017Favorable Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed39
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (41-5)41
House3/10/20173/10/2017First Reading Ways and Means43
3/13/20173/13/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:10 P.M.