SB0379 (CH0198)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted12
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20163/18/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/21/20163/19/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)48
House3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Appropriations51
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/5/20163/29/2016Favorable with Amendments {184568/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/6/20163/30/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-9)62
Senate4/7/20164/1/2016Senate Concur - House Amendment61
Third Reading Passed (44-0)61
Passed Enrolled61
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.