SB0394

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Auditing Requirements - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/27/20171/27/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20172/27/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/20172/28/2017Favorable Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed33
3/2/20173/2/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)35
House3/3/20173/3/2017First Reading Appropriations38
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/10/20174/3/2017Favorable Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
4/10/20174/4/2017Third Reading Passed (136-0)69
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 1:01 P.M.