SB0413 (CH0049)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal History Records Checks - Informal Child Care Providers

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {928671/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (46-1)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Judiciary51
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20133/27/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)60
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.