SB0416 (CH0482)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services

Sponsored by:

Senator Kagan

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Finance
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Favorable with Amendments {967471/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/24/20153/21/2015Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 48
Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 48
Third Reading Passed (37-10)48
House3/25/20153/23/2015First Reading Health and Government Operations53
3/26/20153/26/2015Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20154/6/2015Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/7/20154/1/2015Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/9/20154/3/2015Third Reading Passed (93-45)64
Senate4/10/20154/3/2015Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/30/20155/30/2015Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.