SB0421 (CH0204)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native Language

Sponsored by:

Senator Ramirez

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20162/1/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/20162/3/2016Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable with Amendments {964831/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/10/20163/10/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/11/20163/11/2016First Reading Ways and Means43
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/4/20163/28/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/5/20163/29/2016Third Reading Passed (130-8)61
Senate4/6/20163/31/2016Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.