SB0422 (CH0261)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation Fees

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Finance
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2/4/20132/4/2013Hearing cancelled
2/28/20132/28/2013Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {487370/159
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 59
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable with Amendments {487370/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (34-13)61
House4/4/20133/29/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations62
4/6/20134/6/2013Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/8/20134/8/2013Hearing 4/08 at 11:30 a.m.
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/8/20134/3/2013Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/8/20134/4/2013Third Reading Passed (99-41)68
Senate4/8/20134/6/2013Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.