SB0450 (CH0526)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training

Sponsored by:

Senator Manno

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {964436/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/16/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/16/20173/13/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations47
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/3/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {996389/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)62
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:11 P.M.