SB0477 (CH0040)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers

Sponsored by:

Senator Kagan

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/26/20181/26/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
2/23/20182/23/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed34
2/28/20182/28/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)36
House3/1/20183/1/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations37
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
3/27/20183/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/28/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed (133-5)55
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.