SB0508 (CH0060)

2013 Regular Session



Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds

Sponsored by:

Senator Shank


Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20131/31/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/14/20133/14/2013First Reading Appropriations47
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)63
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.