SB0508

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Interaction With Law Enforcement Officers - Development and Implementation of Curriculum Content

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments {674735/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation50
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20184/7/2018Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 6:06 P.M.