SB0515

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

County Boards of Education - Procurements for Construction or Repair of School Projects

Sponsored by:

Senator DeGrange

Status:

In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20162/5/2016Hearing cancelled
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/4/20163/29/2016Favorable with Amendments {609232/158
Committee Amendment Adopted58
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted58
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Brochin) Adopted 58
4/5/20163/30/2016Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted 59
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {773321/2 Rejected (18-27)59
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {193527/1 Rejected (20-23)59
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {943922/1 Rejected (19-24)59
Floor Amendment (Senator Norman) {223926/1 Rejected (16-29)59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/6/20163/31/2016Third Reading Passed (30-16)60
House4/7/20164/1/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations64
4/8/20164/8/2016Rereferred to Appropriations
Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.