Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session



Career Apprenticeship Investment Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Rosapepe


In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Finance
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {537274/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)42
House3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Appropriations and Economic Matters43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

March 19, 2018 1:36 P.M.