SB0585 (CH0307)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad Faith

Sponsored by:

Senator Middleton

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20141/30/2014First Reading Finance
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/3/20143/3/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable with Amendments {537679/1 Report Adopted38
Second Reading Passed with Amendments38
3/6/20143/6/2014Third Reading Passed (44-0)40
House3/7/20143/7/2014First Reading Economic Matters43
4/2/20144/2/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/2/20143/26/2014Favorable with Amendments {253799/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/3/20143/27/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)63
Senate4/4/20143/26/2014Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments60
Senate Requests House Recede60
Conference Committee Appointed60
Senators Astle, Pugh, and Kittleman60
House4/7/20144/3/2014Motion Recede (Delegate Davis) Adopted70
House Recede70
Third Reading Passed (137-0)70
Senate4/8/20144/1/2014Returned Passed66A
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.