SB0595 (CH0298)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Board of Pharmacy - Wholesale Distribution - Pharmacies

Sponsored by:

Senator Montgomery

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {334338/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/22/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)51
House3/22/20133/19/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations52
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/6/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20134/3/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)67
Senate4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.