SB0611 (CH0561)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Healthy School Facility Fund – Established

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2/15/20182/15/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {914231/1 Report Adopted48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (36-11)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Appropriations50
3/23/20183/23/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20184/3/2018Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/4/20183/26/2018Third Reading Passed (105-33)60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:37 P.M.