SB0618

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

In the House - Conference Committee Appointed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Finance
2/2/20182/2/2018Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance18
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {554734/1 Report Adopted48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations50
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {185669/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)63
Senate4/9/20184/4/2018Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments66
Senate Requests House Recede66
House4/9/20184/4/2018House Refuses to Recede69
Conference Committee Appointed69
Delegates Luedtke, Wilkins, and Rose69

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 11:37 P.M.