SB0651 (CH0843)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions

Sponsored by:

Senator Smith

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments {484035/146A
Special Order until later today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 46A
3/20/20173/18/2017Favorable with Amendments {484035/147
Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 47
3/21/20173/19/2017Favorable with Amendments {484035/1 Report Adopted48
Floor Amendment {413522/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (18-28)48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/22/20173/20/2017Third Reading Passed (32-15)49
House3/23/20173/20/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations54
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (92-46)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:12 P.M.