SB0667 (CH0334)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment

Sponsored by:

Senator Jennings

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {764535/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/16/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (44-2)45
House3/16/20173/13/2017First Reading Ways and Means47
3/17/20173/17/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {515162/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (44-1)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:12 P.M.