SB0672

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/20153/17/2015Favorable with Amendments {824436/144
Laid Over (Senator Eckardt) Adopted44
3/19/20153/19/2015Favorable with Amendments {824436/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt)46
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 46
3/20/20153/20/2015Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt) Adopted47
Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {343126/247
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Conway) Adopted 47
3/23/20153/20/2015Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {343126/247A
Motion separate amendments (Senator Young) Adopted47A
Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Young) Adopted 47A
3/24/20153/21/2015Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {343126/2 Rejected (18-28)48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/25/20153/22/2015Third Reading Passed (45-2)49
House3/26/20153/24/2015First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations54

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:49 P.M.