SB0675 (CH0236)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

Senator Hough

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20182/5/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {504634/1 Report Adopted45
Floor Amendment {273925/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-26)45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)47
House3/15/20183/12/2018First Reading Appropriations46
3/23/20183/23/2018Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/4/20183/26/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/6/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)63
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.