SB0676 (CH0304)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2/15/20132/15/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20133/27/2013Favorable with Amendments {514235/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/2/20133/28/2013Third Reading Passed (43-0)59
House4/2/20133/27/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations60
4/6/20134/6/2013Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/8/20134/8/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/8/20134/3/2013Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/8/20134/5/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)69
Senate4/9/20134/7/2013Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:07 P.M.