SB0729 (CH0034)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/2/20182/2/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments {384530/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/27/20183/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {965062/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-6)55
Senate4/2/20183/28/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments59
Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.