SB0758 (CH0389)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems

Sponsored by:

Senator Guzzone

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2/24/20172/24/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable38
Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 38
3/8/20173/8/2017Favorable39
Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 39
Favorable Report Adopted39
Floor Amendment {873227/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/10/20173/10/2017First Reading Ways and Means43
3/13/20173/13/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20174/8/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/8/20174/1/2017Favorable with Amendments {945260/1 Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/10/20174/3/2017Floor Amendment {883825/1 (Delegate Reznik) Adopted68
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-11)68
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:12 P.M.