SB0764 (CH0229)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the Press

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20163/14/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20163/15/2016Favorable44
Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 44
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable45
Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 45
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {573427/1 Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (36-10)47
House3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Appropriations50
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/5/20163/29/2016Favorable with Amendments {894963/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/6/20163/30/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {123825/1 Adopted62
Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 62
4/7/20164/1/2016Motion Reconsider Floor Amendment {123825/1 Adopted64
Motion Withdrawn Floor Amendment {123825/1 Adopted64
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {933720/1 Adopted64
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-8)64
Senate4/9/20164/3/2016Senate Concur - House Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (37-9)63
Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.