SB0774 (CH0546)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol

Sponsored by:

Senator Mathias

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/21/20132/21/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
3/25/20133/25/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/25/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments {289037/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/26/20133/22/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)53
House3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations55A
4/2/20134/2/2013Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/3/20134/3/2013Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/6/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (132-0)65
Senate4/8/20134/2/2013Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.