SB0783

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2/15/20132/15/2013Hearing cancelled
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.