SB0790 (CH0549)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advance Directive Registry - Fee and Date of Operation

Sponsored by:

Senator Manno

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Finance
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Unfavorable Report by Finance
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable Report by Finance
3/22/20133/20/2013Favorable Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed51
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (41-6)52
House3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations55A
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20134/8/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/8/20134/2/2013Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/8/20134/3/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)67
Senate4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.