SB0818 (CH0562)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Eligibility and Annual Appropriation

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {739032/1 Report Adopted48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations50
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments {805964/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/9/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-13)66
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (45-0)65
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:37 P.M.