SB0856 (CH0839)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds

Sponsored by:

Senator Guzzone

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable with Amendments {288072/1 Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (33-12)56
House3/31/20173/27/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations61
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Appropriations
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20174/8/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/8/20174/1/2017Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed (92-49)67
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Returned Passed63A
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:13 P.M.