SB0866 (CH0609)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Adult High School Pilot Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {284631/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/17/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)46
House3/17/20173/14/2017First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means48
4/4/20174/4/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/4/20173/28/2017Favorable with Amendments {933396/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/5/20173/29/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)63
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:13 P.M.