SB0875

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Zucker

Status:

In the Senate - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {724431/157
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted57
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted57
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {724431/1 Report Adopted58
Floor Amendment {553421/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (44-1)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations59
4/4/20184/5/2018Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/5/20184/5/2018Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments {115762/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/9/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (95-40)66
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (41-0)65
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 4:54 P.M.