SB0911

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action Plan

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed42
3/12/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)44
House3/13/20183/10/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations44
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 21, 2018 1:21 P.M.