SB0921 (CH0002)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2017


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Finance
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20164/1/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/1/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments {457976/157
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted57
4/4/20163/29/2016Favorable with Amendments {457976/1 Report Adopted58
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {413320/1 Adopted58
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 58
4/5/20163/30/2016Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 59
Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {813023/1 Rejected (14-31)59
Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {663129/1 Rejected (15-31)59
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {503023/1 Rejected (22-22)59
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {393723/1 Adopted59
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {133822/1 Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/6/20163/31/2016Third Reading Passed (31-14)60
House4/7/20163/31/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations63
4/7/20164/7/2016Rereferred to Economic Matters
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable Report by Economic Matters
4/9/20164/4/2016Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/11/20164/5/2016Special Order until next session (Delegate McConkey) Adopted 68
4/11/20164/7/2016Third Reading Passed (91-48)70
Senate4/12/20164/8/2016Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate2/2/20172/2/2017Veto overridden (32-13)
House2/7/20172/7/2017Veto overridden (88-51)
Post Passage2/7/20172/7/2017Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2017

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.