SB0956

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory Board

Sponsored by:

Senator Brinkley

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/14/20132/14/2013First Reading Senate Rules
2/20/20132/20/2013Rereferred to Finance
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Hearing cancelled
3/20/20133/20/2013Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.