SB1005

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Baltimore County - Commission to Study the Establishment of a Truancy Reduction Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/20/20132/20/2013First Reading Senate Rules
2/21/20132/21/2013Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/20132/22/2013Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {264734/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)52
House3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Ways and Means55A
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20134/8/2013Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.