SB1021

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Job Reinvestment Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Senator Zucker

Status:

In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/8/20172/8/2017First Reading Senate Rules
2/15/20172/15/2017Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
2/16/20172/16/2017Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20173/29/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20173/25/2017Favorable with Amendments {769330/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/30/20173/26/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)55
House3/30/20173/26/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations60
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:14 P.M.