SB1023

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process

Sponsored by:

Senator Zucker

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/8/20172/8/2017First Reading Senate Rules
2/15/20172/15/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/20172/17/2017Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/20173/19/2017Favorable with Amendments {294532/148
Laid Over (Senator Zucker) Adopted48
3/22/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments {294532/1 Report Adopted (30-15)49
Floor Amendment {643522/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (16-30)49
Floor Amendment {613529/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-28)49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/23/20173/21/2017Third Reading Passed (30-16)50
House3/24/20173/21/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations55
3/27/20173/27/2017Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/7/20173/31/2017Floor Amendment {883827/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (53-83)65
Floor Amendment {633125/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (52-81)65
Floor Amendment {563122/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (51-83)65
Third Reading Passed (87-51)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/8/20175/8/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2017 4:55 P.M.