SB1035

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants and Farebox Recovery Rate

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/17/20162/17/2016First Reading Senate Rules
2/18/20162/19/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
2/24/20162/24/2016Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
3/2/20163/2/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 11, 2016 3:38 P.M.