SB1060 (CH0574)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)

Sponsored by:

Senator Miller

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/13/20172/13/2017First Reading Senate Rules
2/15/20172/15/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {254839/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20173/24/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)53
House3/28/20173/23/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations57
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/5/20174/5/2017Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {766683/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/8/20174/1/2017Floor Amendment {673221/1 (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted66
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (45-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 25, 2017 12:50 P.M.